LET'S GET GROWING LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lets Get Growing provides regular gardening therapy sessions for adults of all ages experiencing a range of mental and physical health difficulties, including depression, anxiety, PTSD, bi polar disorder, dementia and mild learning difficulties. Also one-off therapeutic garden workshops for a range of groups, including addicts in recovery, homeless people, carers, refugees & asylum seeekers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Northumberland
Governance
- 20 April 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ruth Briel | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nuala O'Brien | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HUME | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN EWEN | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.99k | £66.70k | £47.30k | £66.73k | £70.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.05k | £44.77k | £45.74k | £64.26k | £66.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PHYSICAL AND MENTAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, IN HEXHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, BY THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC GARDENING AND HORTICULTURE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE, IN THE SUBJECT OF HORTICULTURE AND RELATED PRACTICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STEEL FARM
STEEL
HEXHAM
NE47 0LG
- Phone:
- 07748600498
- Email:
- katrina_padmore@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window