THOMAS ARNEWAY'S LOAN CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make loans to persons resident in Greater London or in the counties adjoining thereto or in the counties of Bedfordshire, East Sussex, West Sussex and Hampshire who are in need of financial assistance and who are prepared for or engaged in any trade, business or profession with a preference for such persons who are resident in the London Borough of the City of Westminster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Bedford
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 February 2017: CIO registration
- 24 May 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 24 May 2022: Funds transferred to 206964 SAMUEL WILSON'S LOAN CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £780 | £624 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £2.51k | £10.99k | £9.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 17 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 17 April 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 23 FEB 2017 AMENDED ON 18 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
TO MAKE GRANTS TO PERSONS RESIDENT IN GREATER LONDON OR IN THE ADJOINING PARISHES THERETO OR IN THE COUNTIES OF BEDFORDSHIRE, EAST SUSSEX, WEST SUSSEX AND HAMPSHIRE WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE PREPARING FOR OR ENGAGED IN ANY TRADE, BUSINESS OR PROFESSION WITH A PREFERENCE FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window