ST GILES HOSPICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Giles Hospice provides excellent palliative care and enables our communities to support each other in living the best life they can to the very end, focusing on what matters most to individuals, families and our community on issues relating to terminal illness, death, dying and loss. Services: IPU, Community Nursing, 24/7 Advice, Therapies/Clinics, Education, Bereavement Support & Physiotherapy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£12,282,931
Donations and legacies | £4.03m | |
Charitable activities | £3.39m | |
Other trading activities | £4.71m | |
Investments | £151.53k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£13,143,832
Raising funds | £3.83m | |
Charitable activities | £9.31m | |
Other | £0 |
£347,041 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £913,370 from 7 government contract(s) and £1,628,429 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.83m | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.31m |
People

221 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
385 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 25 July 1979: Standard registration
- 20 March 2012: Funds received from 1022027 WALSALL HOSPICE
- ST GILES (Working name)
- ST GILES HOME LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Jean Bedford | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Roderick | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Shanahan | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Ingham | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Jones | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Simon James | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jennings | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN RIDLER | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.83m | £16.78m | £13.68m | £12.88m | £12.28m | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.55m | £13.06m | £12.20m | £12.98m | £13.14m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.99k | N/A | £18.22k | £867.55k | £913.37k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.47m | £4.99m | £1.63m | £1.63m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.26m | £4.47m | £3.63m | £4.50m | £4.03m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.53m | £4.01m | £4.82m | £4.97m | £4.71m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.91m | £6.81m | £5.01m | £3.29m | £3.39m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £130.84k | £105.35k | £113.63k | £120.53k | £151.53k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £749.01k | £4.99k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.39m | £2.04m | £1.60m | £2.65m | £2.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.03m | £9.32m | £8.81m | £9.46m | £9.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.52m | £3.75m | £3.39m | £3.52m | £3.83m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £111.10k | £101.44k | £75.64k | £406.26k | £335.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £14.96k | £9.88k | £16.32k | £15.02k | £15.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £11.46m | £11.11m | £10.79m | £10.90m | £10.57m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.98m | £3.72m | £3.93m | £3.68m | £3.98m | |
|
Other assets | £3.02m | £6.39m | £8.28m | £7.52m | £7.48m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.15m | £1.19m | £1.27m | £704.09k | £1.18m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/06/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/02/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 SEP 2015 as amended on 06 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. GILES HOSPICE
FISHERWICK ROAD
LICHFIELD
WS14 9LH
- Phone:
- 01543434537
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window