Financial history TRENDLEWOOD CHURCH

Charity Number: 1170989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £79.01k £76.15k £62.32k £137.45k £50.57k
Total expenditure £68.93k £61.22k £62.35k £60.83k £52.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A