Trustees TRENDLEWOOD CHURCH
Charity Number: 1170989

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Morey Andrews | Chair | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Austin | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Sanderson | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Sheffield | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMON TIMOTHY CROSS | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karan Price | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDSAY HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.