Accounts and annual returns BUILDING COMMUNITIES NOTTINGHAM

Charity Number: 1171915
Charity reporting is overdue by 1732 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 271 days
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 271 days
Annual return 20 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 637 days
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 637 days
Annual return 20 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1002 days
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1002 days
Annual return 20 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1367 days
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1367 days
Annual return 20 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1732 days
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1732 days