AFAN VALLEY COMMUNITY LEISURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of leisure facilities predominantly a swimming pool in the afan valley area of NPT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 15 December 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SCOTT JONES | Chair | 27 August 2015 |
|
|||||
GLORIA JEAN PARKER | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA JOHNSON | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ARTHUR GARRY JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROYSTON THOMAS LEWIS | Trustee | 27 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.84k | £59.39k | £97.59k | £93.75k | £34.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.20k | £50.09k | £101.04k | £126.10k | £56.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 July 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 July 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 June 2022 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 June 2022 | 361 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 SEP 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UPPER AFAN VALLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WELLBEING, SELF-IMPROVEMENT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A SWIMMING POOL AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AFONDALE
AVON STREET
CYMMER
PORT TALBOT
SA13 3LT
- Phone:
- 07899925805
- Email:
- afanvalleycl@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window