CLASSICAL SHEFFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Classical Sheffield is a local charity committed to championing music makers and music making across the city of Sheffield. In doing so the charity connects over 60 organisations across the city's amateur, professional, and educational classical music provision. As part of this work Classical Sheffield promotes a major bi-annual festival the Classical Weekend.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 July 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 04 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Towler | Chair | 21 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Revis | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor George Thomas Frederick Nicholson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Potter | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Sarah Hulse | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Joan O'Neill | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Mary Elizabeth Charlesworth | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael Buxton | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ANNE SUNDERLAND | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ANNE ADAMS | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|||||
ROBERT EDWARD WEBB | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DANIEL CLARKE | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/07/2020 | 05/07/2021 | 05/07/2022 | 05/07/2023 | 05/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.41k | £9.28k | £7.06k | £25.82k | £8.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.92k | £4.33k | £7.29k | £20.60k | £10.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.00k | £3.00k | £5.10k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 July 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 July 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF FESTIVALS, EVENTS, PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O MUSIC IN THE ROUND
CENTRAL LIBRARY
SURREY STREET
SHEFFIELD
S1 1XZ
- Phone:
- 01142814660
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window