FND DIMENSIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FND Dimensions aims to build a network of 'peer support' groups for those people diagnosed with Functional Neurological Disorders. Through these groups the feeling of isolation and confusion can be greatly deminished and people can share experiences of living with FND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeanette Michele Clarke | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Whittle | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laurie Elizabeth Lolita Dragonsmith | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leigh-Ann Wade | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Elizabeth Bratton | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE-ROXANNE BLANCO | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH WEBSTER | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.82k | £12.03k | £2.51k | £14.75k | £9.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.90k | £11.45k | £2.27k | £7.06k | £13.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF FND (FUNCTIONAL NEUROLOGICAL DISORDER) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO FND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 Peveril Crescent
West Hallam
Ilkeston
DE7 6ND
- Phone:
- 07477 145912
- Email:
- enquiries@fnddimensions.org
- Website:
-
fnddimensions.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window