Financial history HOME-START ESSEX

Charity Number: 1170940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £781.30k £821.38k £799.93k £795.52k £952.75k
Total expenditure £740.05k £621.02k £751.53k £799.07k £918.41k
Income from government contracts N/A £107.06k £76.77k £76.20k £175.00k
Income from government grants £8.25k £107.06k £20.64k £17.23k £90.12k
Income - Donations and legacies £58.95k £117.86k £80.44k £16.20k £15.32k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £2.33k £16.09k £27.98k £250.92k
Income - Charitable activities £719.18k £670.84k £701.97k £749.31k £681.58k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £2.03k £4.93k
Income - Other £3.17k £30.35k £1.43k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £738.17k £621.02k £749.17k £795.31k £776.49k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.88k £0 £2.36k £3.75k £141.92k
Expenditure - Governance £18.08k £10.06k £11.52k £12.44k £12.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0