Accounts and annual returns EASTERN JUNIOR ALLIANCE FOOTBALL LEAGUE

Charity Number: 1172031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 20 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 20 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 22 April 2024 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 April 2024 53 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 22 April 2024 419 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 06 July 2023 128 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 06 April 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 04 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 31 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 31 March 2021 31 days late Download Open in new window