FITZFEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Concerts, Workshops, Talks, Lectures, Dramatic Performances, Poetry, Community Events, Education Events, Walks Exploring the Area. All to celebrate the area of Fitzrovia, in Central London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Camden
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 16 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL BATES | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire-Louise Rachel Thane Hampton John | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BOAS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN CARPENTER | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/11/2019 | 05/11/2020 | 05/11/2021 | 05/11/2022 | 05/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.77k | £0 | £3.75k | £12.33k | £12.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.25k | £0 | £3.33k | £6.88k | £8.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 November 2023 | 07 September 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2023 | 07 September 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 November 2022 | 29 October 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2022 | 29 October 2023 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 November 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 November 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 November 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE ARTS BY PROMOTING A SERIES OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, DRAMATIC PERFORMANCES, EXHIBITIONS AND OTHER CULTURAL EVENTS CELEBRATING THE CULTURAL HERITAGE OF FITZROVIA, LONDON (II) TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, LECTURES AND MUSIC EDUCATION WORK PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN FITZROVIA AND TO ENCOURAGE THE GIVING OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES BY SCHOOLS, CHOIRS AND OTHER LIKE ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DUDLEY MANSIONS
17 HANSON STREET
LONDON
W1W 6TJ
- Phone:
- 07956484812
- Email:
- dsbates@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window