Governing document WEST GLAMORGAN COUNCIL ON ALCOHOL AND DRUG ABUSE
Charity number: 509029
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JUNE 1979 AS AMENDED 30 SEPTEMBER 1982, 26 SEPTEMBER 1985, 25 SEPTEMBER 1986 AND 4 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT, PREVENTION AND REHABILITATION OF ALCOHOL AND DRUG ABUSE OF CLIENTS TOGETHER WITH ALL INCIDENTAL SERVICES RELATING THERETO WITHIN THE AREA OF THE IECHYD MORGANWG HEALTH AUTHORITYT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WEST GLAMORGAN
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.