LONGBARN RESIDENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Longbarn Residents Association activities are all carried out for the benefit of the residents of the Longbarn estate in Padgate, Warrington. They include: Afternoon Teas for the Elderly, Ukulele teaching sessions, regular meetings for members, Trips to Places of interest, etc (to be continued, RR 3 March 2019).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warrington
Governance
- 22 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Anthony McLaughlin | Chair | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katy WALLACE | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Taylor | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
LYNN COLTER-HOWARD | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Howard Martin Klein | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Adams | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PHILIP PEARSON | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.43k | £15.14k | £8.39k | £21.69k | £14.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.02k | £6.61k | £8.10k | £24.52k | £20.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £487 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 22 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 22 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Nov 2016 as amended on 21 Sep 2018 as amended on 28 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LONGBARN, WARRINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND (B) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Kassia Academy
Fallowfield Grove
Longbarn
Warrington
Cheshire
WA2 0QQ
- Phone:
- 01925820647
- Email:
- lrasecretary15@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window