FRIENDS OF RUSH COMMON

Charity number: 1169863
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A parent volunteer group raising funds for Rush Common School. The object of the Association is to advance the education of the Pupils in school in particular by: 1. Developing effective relationships between staff parents and others associated with the school 2. Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school or advance the education of the pupils

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £20,158
Total expenditure: £6,718

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Strugnell Chair 18 October 2021
None on record
Keri Marie Mitchell Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
Laura Ann Green Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
Adele Brown Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
Lucy Briggs Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Jones Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
Victoria Dobson Trustee 26 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £12.83k £7.05k £2.74k £12.98k £20.16k
Total expenditure £7.69k £1.08k £6.92k £5.90k £6.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 July 2024 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 Wick Close
ABINGDON
Oxfordshire
OX14 2NQ
Phone:
07823885492
Website:

No information available