Financial history ST JOHN'S DEAF COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1170545
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/05/2020 04/05/2021 04/05/2022 04/05/2023 04/05/2024
Total gross income £41.83k £40.67k £45.78k £113.82k £104.44k
Total expenditure £43.08k £33.91k £51.88k £86.43k £95.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A