ST JOHN'S DEAF COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St John's Deaf Community Centre is open regularly on most days of the week. They offer a huge range of activities and events, providing a warm welcome to anyone who is Deaf, Deafened, Hard of Hearing and their friends and family. St John's organises regular functions, the club has a great atmosphere and new members are most welcome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 December 2016: Standard registration
- ST JOHN'S DEAF CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aaron Miller | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW ROBERT BANKS | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEFFERY MARK DREW | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE DREW | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/05/2020 | 04/05/2021 | 04/05/2022 | 04/05/2023 | 04/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.83k | £40.67k | £45.78k | £113.82k | £104.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.08k | £33.91k | £51.88k | £86.43k | £95.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 May 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 May 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 May 2022 | 23 May 2023 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2022 | 16 May 2024 | 439 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 May 2021 | 16 May 2022 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2021 | 16 May 2022 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 May 2020 | 28 April 2022 | 420 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2020 | 28 April 2022 | 420 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JUL 2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT DEAF PEOPLE AND SIGN LANGUAGE USERS IN NORTH LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND ALSO IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND INTERNATIONALLY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH THE SAID INDIVIDUALS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH INDIVIDUALS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John's Deaf Community Centre
258 Green Lanes
LONDON
N4 2HE
- Phone:
- 07738403060
- Email:
- matthew@sjdcc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window