WESTON-SUPER-MARE CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold regular Breaking of Bread services and Public addresses on Sundays and Bible Classes during the week. The public addresses and Bible Classes are advertised to the public on notice boards outside our meeting hall and on our website. They may also be promoted by the distribution of leaflets and advertisements in the local paper from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Somerset
Governance
- 10 May 2017: Standard registration
- WESTON CHRISTADELPHIANS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER GORDON ROGERS | Chair | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
Lionel John Albert Haines | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mathias | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Stephen George Sweeting | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR COLIN JANNAWAY | Trustee | 01 January 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.66k | £2.05k | £9.24k | £12.07k | £12.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.60k | £4.44k | £6.11k | £16.54k | £17.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTADELPHIAN BIRMINGHAM AMENDED STATEMENT OF FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHRISTADELPHIAN COMMUNITY AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS FOR WORSHIP, PRAYER AND THE PREACHING OF THE GOSPEL, PROVIDING RELIGIOUS TEACHING AND PUBLICATIONS, THE PROMOTION OF CHARITABLE WORKS AND THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 TYLER GREEN
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS22 7DZ
- Phone:
- 01934518344
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window