Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HIGH BEACH
Charity number: 1170115

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Victoria Jane Yeadon | Chair | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Wackett | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dasrika Wijesuriya | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Stavrou | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Harrison | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stella Ann MURPHY | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Jean POTTER | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Baird | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Harragan | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Amy Garrett | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Rumbelow | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Mark Horton | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON HODGKINSON | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GREGOR ROGER MARTIN DAVIS | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sally Anne Jane Begley | Trustee | 10 April 1997 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.