BREAST FRIENDS NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Breast Friends Northamptonshire provides practical and emotional support for people affected by Breast Cancer in Northamptonshire and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 16 February 2017: CIO registration
- BREAST FRIENDS NORTHAMPTON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEONIE HEARD | Chair | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Plater Mrs | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Kennedy | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.68k | £17.09k | £31.96k | £31.96k | £35.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.19k | £23.96k | £27.46k | £27.46k | £35.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Feb 2017 as amended on 04 Jul 2019 as amended on 31 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE DIAGNOSED WITH BREAST CANCER IN NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: BY PROVIDING PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO THOSE DIAGNOSED WITH, THEIR SUPPORTERS AND THOSE AFFECTED BY BREAST CANCER. PROMOTING AWARENESS OF BREAST CANCER IN OUR COMMUNITY THROUGH EDUCATION AND INFORMATION OF ANY RELEVANT WIDER SUPPORT AVAILABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Campus Drive
NORTHAMPTON
NN2 7FN
- Phone:
- 07582394956
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window