STAUNTON HAROLD SAILABILITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing sailing and waterborne acitivities and Experiences for the disabled , elderly or with special needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottinghamshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 15 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HARDEN | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Foskett | Trustee | 28 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Macnamara | Trustee | 28 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Tinkler | Trustee | 11 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane Margaret Hooper | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
LISA JOANNE WOODWARD | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DOMINIC KENNINGTON | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.33k | £12.94k | £7.78k | £10.31k | £13.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.70k | £9.40k | £12.18k | £9.68k | £14.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 December 2023 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 December 2023 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SAILING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
103 ASHBY ROAD
MOIRA
SWADLINCOTE
DE12 6DN
- Phone:
- 01283219300
- Email:
- chairman@shst.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window