THE COMMONWEALTH WAR GRAVES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CWGF is a charitable foundation highlighting the work of the Commonwealth War Graves Commission (CWGC). We engage young people from communities around the UK interested in the story of our common sacrifice and shared history. By supporting the CWGF, people will enable us to fund education and activities which will capture the public imagination, and highlight the work the CWGC does.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£616,123
Donations and legacies | £490.28k | |
Charitable activities | £64.01k | |
Other trading activities | £56.42k | |
Investments | £5.42k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£594,440
Raising funds | £361.39k | |
Charitable activities | £233.05k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £361.39k | |
Charitable expenditure | £233.05k | |
Retained for future use | £21.68k |
People

3 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt Hon Philip Martin Dunne | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Gerald Anthony Allison | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Walsh | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Ascott Evans | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Rt Hon Kevan Jones | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAME JUDITH MAYHEW JONAS DBE | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Captain Jagjeet Singh-Sohal | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sir Adrian Alastair Montague | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIG ALASTAIR ANDREW BERNARD REIBEY BRUCE OF CRIONAICH | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341.90k | £566.85k | £415.65k | £404.69k | £616.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £339.07k | £250.67k | £376.37k | £802.11k | £594.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £499.42k | N/A | N/A | £490.28k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £7.80k | N/A | N/A | £56.42k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £59.62k | N/A | N/A | £64.01k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £5.42k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £70.75k | N/A | N/A | £128.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £138.50k | N/A | N/A | £233.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £112.17k | N/A | N/A | £361.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £7.02k | N/A | N/A | £6.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £50.00k | N/A | N/A | £126.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £511.51k | N/A | N/A | £225.11k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £98.03k | N/A | N/A | £149.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 08 MAR 2017 AMENDED ON 06 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF GRAVES, CEMETERIES, BUILDINGS AND MEMORIALS FOR THE BURIAL AND COMMEMORATION OF MEMBERS OF THE NAVAL, MILITARY AND ARMED FORCES FROM COUNTRIES OF THE COMMONWEALTH WHO WERE KILLED DURING THE FIRST WORLD WAR OR THE SECOND WORLD WAR ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION), THROUGH THE SUPPORT OF CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES UNDERTAKEN BY THE COMMONWEALTH WAR GRAVES COMMISSION; (B) TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP AMONG THE PEOPLE OF THE COMMONWEALTH THROUGH THE COMMEMORATION OF MEMBERS OF THE NAVAL, MILITARY AND ARMED FORCES FROM COUNTRIES OF THE COMMONWEALTH WHO WERE KILLED DURING THE FIRST WORLD WAR AND THE SECOND WORLD WAR; AND (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE FIRST WORLD WAR AND THE SECOND WORLD WAR, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION), THROUGH ADVANCING EDUCATION IN THE LIVES OF THOSE COMMEMORATED BY THE COMMONWEALTH WAR GRAVES COMMISSION AND IN THE HISTORY OF THE CEMETERIES, BUILDINGS AND MEMORIALS MAINTAINED BY THE COMMONWEALTH WAR GRAVES COMMISSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Commonwealth War Graves Commission
2 Marlow Road
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 7DX
- Phone:
- 01628507278
- Email:
- LAURA.STOKER@CWGC.ORG
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window