Financial history THE SUTTON HOO SHIP'S COMPANY

Charity Number: 1175475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £112.26k £112.26k £203.40k £204.26k £223.98k
Total expenditure £67.60k £67.60k £32.17k £35.68k £41.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £750 £3.25k N/A