THE SUTTON HOO SHIP'S COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE SUTTON HOO SHIP'S COMPANY WILL RECONSTRUCT THE SHIP BURIED UNDER MOUND 1 AT SUTTON HOO AROUND 625 . THE SHIP WILL BE BUILT ON THE SURVIVING INFORMATION AND THE BEST ARCHAEOLOGICAL RESEARCH OF THE DAY. THE SHIP WILL BE TRIALLED ON THE WATER TO TEST HYPOTHESES ABOUT ITS USE. THE BUILD AND TRIALS WILL INVOLVE SHIPWRIGHTS AND ROWERS OF ALL ABILITIES, THE COUNTRY WILL ACQUIRE A HISTORICAL ICON.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
- Derbyshire
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Essex
- Lincolnshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sean McMillan | Chair | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Newman | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Geake | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Lea | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Kindleysides | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Damian Robinson | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Care Evans | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jonathon Steel | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Startin | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor MARTIN CARVER | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FITZGERALD | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.26k | £112.26k | £203.40k | £204.26k | £223.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.60k | £67.60k | £32.17k | £35.68k | £41.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £750 | £3.25k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 OCT 2016 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN NAUTICAL ARCHAEOLOGY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) CONSTRUCTING, MAINTAINING AND OPERATING A REPLICA SHIP BASED ON THE SEVENTH CENTURY SHIP FOUND AT SUTTON HOO IN SUFFOLK, ENGLAND. B) CARRYING OUT TRIALS OF THE REPLICA SHIP ON WATER AND LAND. C) CONDUCTING RESEARCH ON THE REPLICA SHIP, AND SHARING THE RESULTS WITH THE ACADEMIC COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER PUBLIC. D) PUBLICLY EXHIBITING THE REPLICA SHIP. E) PROVIDING CRAFT OPPORTUNITIES DURING CONSTRUCTION AND OPERATION FOR PERSONS OF DIFFERING LEVELS OF ABILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LONGSHED
TIDE MILL WAY
WOODBRIDGE
SUFFOLK
IP12 1FP
- Phone:
- 07785990311
- Email:
- contact@saxonship.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window