NEWARK DEMENTIA CARER'S GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise regular events including craft, music, table games, seated sports, meals, trips and holidays. Our members are people with personal experience of dementia. Carers are welcome to remain in the group after the person they supported dies or moves into residential care. People with dementia are welcome to attend, but we do not offer any supervision nor any personal care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 19 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Daubney | Chair | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ann oswald | Trustee | 26 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Cullen | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Seymour | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edith Pacey | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bell Christine Davison | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Brummitt | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.70k | £7.09k | £12.27k | £16.73k | £22.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.88k | £1.60k | £16.11k | £15.42k | £11.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE NEWARK DEMENTIA CARER'S GROUP ARE: FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS WITHIN NEWARK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA: (1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH; AND (2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
121 VALLEY PROSPECT
NEWARK
NG24 4QS
- Phone:
- 01636702577
- Email:
- kendaubney1@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window