Accounts and annual returns AMMANFORD AND DISTRICT CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU

Charity Number: 509047
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 22 April 2009 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 24 March 2009 52 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 23 April 2009 448 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 24 March 2009 418 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 23 April 2009 813 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 14 May 2009 834 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 21 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 20 October 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 15 November 2004 On Time