Financial history AMMANFORD AND DISTRICT CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU

Charity Number: 509047
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £453.76k £387.26k £507.97k £278.50k £170.00k
Total expenditure £364.25k £334.20k £446.15k £281.17k £185.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A