Financial history PADDLE ROUND THE PIER

Charity Number: 1174337
Charity reporting is up to date (143 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £93.01k £3.29k £1.21k £5.17k £2.01k
Total expenditure £103.97k £25.02k £3.22k £9.07k £4.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A