Accounts and annual returns THE HABITAT FIRST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required