THE HABITAT FIRST FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation's objective is the relief of sickness and the promotion of health in children and former members of the armed forces who are mentally or physically disabled. The ultimate goal is to build a unique property for providing or assisting in the provision of respite holidays at Habitat First Group sites.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Dorset
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 July 2017: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Funds received from 1075649 TENNIS FIRST CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUW WATSON | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM VICARY | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
RED PAXTON | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUBY HAINES | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RORY PAXTON | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.49k | £36.48k | £46.12k | £69.87k | £8.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £451 | £480 | £1.80k | £2.10k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH OF, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES WHO ARE MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY DISABLED BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RESPITE HOLIDAYS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Habitat First Group
4 Priory Court
Poulton
CIRENCESTER
GL7 5JB
- Phone:
- 01285 863280
- Email:
- mviney@habitatfirstgroup.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window