Financial history EAST DORSET LAWN TENNIS & CROQUET CLUB LIMITED

Charity Number: 1171297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £163.47k £179.76k £233.40k £254.73k £274.05k
Total expenditure £138.19k £107.69k £138.62k £162.74k £208.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £39.50k £12.40k N/A N/A