EAST DORSET LAWN TENNIS & CROQUET CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community participation in healthy recreation for the public benefit the provision of facilities for playing sports, for the benefit of the inhabitants of Poole of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals for the public at large in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the condition of life of the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Poole
Governance
- 25 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Graham | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Powe | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nation | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Crowe | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Hobden | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Alida Webb | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Ann Simmonds | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clive Kent Richardson | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Daniel Gribbin | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.47k | £179.76k | £233.40k | £254.73k | £274.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.19k | £107.69k | £138.62k | £162.74k | £208.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.50k | £12.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS (ÆOBJECTSÆ) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF TENNIS, CROQUET AND OTHER APPROPRIATE CHARITABLE SPORTS. (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF POOLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.'
Contact information
- Address:
-
East Dorset Lawn Tennis & Croquet C
Salterns Road
POOLE
BH14 8BL
- Phone:
- 01202 740219
- Email:
- info@edltcc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window