PETTY POOL

Charity Number: 1174082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

- To educate and train young people with learning disabilities including vocational and basic skills and personal development, preparing them for possible work placements and employment and encouraging independent living - To Promote the personal development of young people, including those with learning disabilities, through the provision of challenging activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Halton
  • Manchester City
  • Warrington
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 November 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MID CHESHIRE SHELTERED WORKSHOP (Working name)
  • THE PETTY POOL TRUST (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Lesley Josephs Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Eleanor Jayne Lees-Jones Trustee 27 January 2021
TERRA NOVA SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Lachlan Nisbet Trustee 19 February 2018
None on record
Craig Michael Williams Trustee 19 February 2018
None on record
BRIAN RICHARD PHILLIPS Trustee 19 February 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.46m £2.49m £2.72m £2.99m £3.58m
Total expenditure £2.30m £2.42m £2.72m £3.05m £3.75m
Income from government contracts £2.17m N/A £2.30m £2.41m £2.88m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £151.66k £16.46k £53.33k £42.38k £50.25k
Income - Other trading activities £425 £48.00k £48.00k £48.00k £48.00k
Income - Charitable activities £2.28m £2.41m £2.60m £2.88m £3.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £24.81k £17.04k £22.42k £23.27k £24.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £9.79k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.26m £2.41m £2.70m £3.04m £3.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £40.20k £14.01k £17.83k £10.17k £55.79k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £82.96k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £9.19k £9.71k £10.17k £55.79k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets £1.16m £1.12m £1.40m £1.00m £993.92k
Long-term investments £950.15k £1.09m £1.05m £1.39m £1.43m
Other assets £931.83k £1.18m £810.05k £736.58k £736.49k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £338.16k £435.74k £418.86k £341.96k £436.25k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 08 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 08 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 23 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 10 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 10 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 05 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 05 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 10 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 21 MARCH 1983 AS AMENDED 4TH MARCH 2003 AND 25 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY, WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO EDUCATE AND TRAIN YOUNG PEOPLE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, INCLUDING VOCATIONAL AND BASIC SKILLS, PERSONAL COMPETENCIES AND PREPARING THEM FOR POSSIBLE EMPLOYMENT/PLACEMENT, AND ENCOURAGING INDEPENDENT LIVING; (2) TO PROMOTE THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CHALLENGING ACTIVITIES WITHIN A RESIDENTIAL SETTING; (3) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE ACCORDING TO THE LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES WHICH SHALL BE SELECTED BY THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 09 November 1983 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
PETTY POOL
PETTY POOL OUTDOOR CENTRE
CHESTER ROAD
SANDIWAY
NORTHWICH
CW8 2DR
Phone:
01606889097