BYRNE AVENUE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To restore Byrne Avenue Baths. To re-open Byrne Avenue Baths as a sports and community centre run by the charity for the community. To provide a range of sports, healthy activities and community events for local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £30,155 from 5 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wirral
Governance
- 16 March 2017: Standard registration
- 12 July 2024: Funds received from 701518 HOYLAKE HISTORICAL SOCIETY
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Frances Ward | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Patrick O'Keeffe | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Michael Johns | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Kiermasz | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Howard Sherlock | Trustee | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £388.47k | £221.57k | £173.18k | £146.07k | £135.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.16k | £116.41k | £189.42k | £157.31k | £137.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.98k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £220.60k | £5.85k | £32.77k | £10.53k | £30.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 November 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 November 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF WIRRAL AND THE NATION AT LARGE THE GRADE II LISTED BUILDING OF SPECIAL ARCHITECTURAL AND HISTORIC INTEREST KNOWN AS BYRNE AVENUE SWIMMING BATHS. (2) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF ROCK FERRY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Byrne Avenue Baths
Byrne Avenue
BIRKENHEAD
Merseyside
CH42 4PQ
- Phone:
- 01519260026
- Email:
- hello@byrneavenuebaths.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window