FOR OUR UNSPOKEN FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are: Clause 3.1 - to advance such charitable purposes according to the law of England and Wales as the Trustees see fit from time to time. And it is hereby declared that, without prejudice to the generality of the objects in clause 3.1, the charity may advance such charitable purposes in the UK or abroad, and in relation to both humans and animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAYESH VINODRAI PATEL | Chair | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RISHI JAYESH PATEL | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £496 | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (OBJECTS) ARE: 3.1 TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. AND IT IS HEREBY DECLARED THAT, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE OBJECTS IN SUB-CLAUSE 3.1, THE CHARITY MAY ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UK OR ABROAD, AND IN RELATION TO BOTH HUMANS AND ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
Hollyoak
21 Eastbury Avenue
NORTHWOOD
HA6 3LH
- Phone:
- 07789745246
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window