Accounts and annual returns DEARNE VALLEY PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT CENTRE

Charity Number: 1170756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 15 May 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 15 May 2024 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 29 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 08 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window