DESFORD LIBRARY COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a public library for recreation and/or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have a need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, financial hardship or social and economic circumstances for the public at large in the interests of social welfare in Desford and surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 28 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNA MARGARET REGAN | Chair | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Christopher Evans | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Steeve Reeves | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
DAVID ANTONY CLARICOATES | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
COLIN CRANE | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Jane Elizabeth Snookes | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
PATRICIA CRANE | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.38k | £15.56k | £16.11k | £13.78k | £7.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £2.11k | £11.98k | £13.30k | £19.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.79k | £9.45k | £650 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 December 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 December 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 December 2021 | 423 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 December 2021 | 423 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
1.THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC LIBRARY IN DESFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. 2. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF DESFORD AND SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC LIBRARY FOR RECREATION AND OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE A NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN DESFORD AND SURROUNDING AREA BY OPERATING AND MANAGING A LENDING LIBRARY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DESFORD LIBRARY COMMUNITY HUB
MAIN STREET
DESFORD
LEICESTER
LE9 9JP
- Phone:
- 07747107237
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window