Financial history THE GATE CHURCH

Charity number: 1171487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £100.56k £79.98k £91.84k £109.69k £117.92k
Total expenditure £64.00k £88.59k £106.36k £106.95k £106.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A