THE ROBERT AND ROSIE WRIGHT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Robert and Rosie Wright Charity works throughout England to advance education and educational establishments to give students the best possible future prospects, especially those from disadvantaged circumstances. We work closely with Cranfield University and The Wellington Academy. We also work to prevent poverty of homeless people and advance the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 25 January 2017: Standard registration
- THE ROBERT WRIGHT CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT ADRIAN WRIGHT | Chair | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Ward | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Janty Routh | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY JANE WRIGHT | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19 | £0 | £349 | £7.73k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.70k | £93.39k | £218.51k | £158.16k | £310.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 13 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND FOR UK BASED CHARITIES: 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) 3.1.1.1 PROVIDING SEED CORN FUNDS AND BURSARIES TO CURRENT AND FORMER STUDENTS OF CRANFIELD UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE ROAD, CRANFIELD, MK43 0AL TO DEVELOP SCIENCE, ENGINEERING, TECHNOLOGY AND MANAGEMENT; 3.1.1.2 IMPROVING THE EDUCATION AND FUTURE PROSPECTS OF ALL CHILDREN AT THE WELLINGTON ACADEMIES, TIDWORTH, INCLUDING CHILDREN OF CURRENT AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE UK ARMED FORCES.3.1.2 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF HOMELESS PEOPLE WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON HOMELESS CHILDREN INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) FRIENDS OF THE CHILDREN OF ORISSA (REGISTERED CHARITY 1074935); 3.1.3 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH, DISABILITY, UNEMPLOYMENT OR ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE; 3.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) PROVIDING FUNDS TO THE MOZART LONDON PLAYERS, ST JOHN'S, ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, SYLVAN ROAD, LONDON, SE19 2RX; AND 3.1.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 3.2 THE CHARITY SHALL ACHIEVE THE OBJECTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST THOSE IN NEED OR TO PREVENT POVERTY. 3.3 WITHOUT BINDING THE TRUSTEES TO ANY PROCESS FOR ACHIEVING THE OBJECTS, BUT BY WAY OF GUIDANCE AND TO ENDEAVOUR TO ENSURE THE DILIGENT AND ENERGETIC AND PROACTIVE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS AND THE APPLICATION OF ITS FUNDS, THE TRUSTEES HAVE AGREED A POLICY STATEMENT OF EVEN DATE HEREWITH. 3.4 NOTHING IN THIS DEED SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEES INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 CAMBRIDGE STREET
LONDON
SW1V 4PR
- Phone:
- 02076309815
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window