BADI & SAHIRI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects are: a) the advancement of education, including by the provision of English language classes b) the relief of unemployment; c) the promotion and preservation of good health and d) The promotion of recreational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Ivory Coast
Governance
- 26 January 2017: Standard registration
- MARY BRO FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DJILET YVONNE BADI SAHIRI | Chair | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JASON QUARTENG | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
LIGBOUHON ALINE PELAGIE SAHIRI | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.60k | £17.40k | £16.38k | £11.20k | £8.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.50k | £13.60k | £14.20k | £11.00k | £7.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 11 September 2024 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 11 October 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 11 October 2022 | 376 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 11 October 2022 | 741 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 JAN 2017 as amended on 31 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PEOPLE FROM OTHER COUNTRIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC SERVICES BY: 1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON EMPLOYMENT 2. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY 4. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
121 Lancaster Road
SOUTHALL
UB1 1AP
- Phone:
- 07367345526
- Email:
- marybrofoundation@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window