SUSSEX STREET CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching, teaching Baptism The Lord's supper Evangelism, Mission Teaching, encouragement, welcome, and inclusion of children, young people and families Nurturing Christian disciples Education, training for Christian and community service Giving, encouraging pastoral support Supporting, encouraging charitable social action Operating a food bank
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 03 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Battams | Chair | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edward Thornton | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samson Gill | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Round | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Lesley Round | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smith | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD ANTHONY LANDON | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Trevor John Casey | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.45k | £181.01k | £267.37k | £741.97k | £250.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.89k | £150.16k | £145.45k | £652.20k | £352.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £300.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £740.24k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.14k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £585 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £652.20k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 2) THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sussex Street Christian Centre
15 Sussex Street
RHYL
LL18 1SE
- Phone:
- 01745342268
- Email:
- trevorjcasey@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window