SCOTTY'S LITTLE SOLDIERS

Charity number: 1170528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing support to bereaved British Forces children & young people through our Assistance Programmes: Smiles, Support and Strides. Smiles provides fun-based opportunities for children to smile again. Support is focused on health & well-being & includes access to professional bereavement counselling in conjunction with partners. Strides provides access to small education and development grants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 December 2016: CIO registration
  • 01 November 2024: Funds received from 1136854 SCOTTY'S LITTLE SOLDIERS
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ellen Plumer Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Jonathan James Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
EAMONN O'SULLIVAN Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
JASON WORTHY Trustee 09 January 2020
None on record
Simon Richard Millar Trustee 23 May 2018
None on record
Steven Ward Trustee 01 February 2018
None on record
LUKE PRIESTLEY Trustee 02 December 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £852.70k £892.14k £1.19m £1.62m £1.49m
Total expenditure £842.74k £806.56k £1.05m £1.35m £1.55m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £742.44k £846.22k £1.15m £1.29m £1.44m
Income - Other trading activities £110.26k £45.92k £43.54k £337.50k £56.47k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £612.22k £577.18k £842.61k £1.02m £1.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £229.79k £229.38k £212.36k £325.15k £306.71k
Expenditure - Governance £10.72k £13.12k £12.57k £12.38k £11.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £725 £0 £0 £0 £785

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £493.02k £470.06k £481.24k £653.07k £604.52k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £462.37k £564.75k £693.40k £788.14k £883.37k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £42.94k £46.79k £50.10k £40.25k £145.07k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PO Box 1273
King's Lynn DO
PE30 9HD
Phone:
0800 092 8571