BRITISH AFRICAN CONNEXIONS

Charity number: 1171412
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ADVANCING EDUCATION BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL COURSES SUCH AS AFTER-SCHOOL CLUBS, WORKSHOPS AND TUITION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LONDON AREA. WE EMPOWER YOUNG PEOPLE IN OUR COMMUNITY TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION, SKILLS DEVELOPMENT AND RAISE AWARENESS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2019

Total income: £97,865
Total expenditure: £50,305

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 2017: CIO registration
  • 28 May 2020: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 28 May 2020: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BAC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019
Total gross income £23.50k £97.87k
Total expenditure £22.85k £50.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2019 11 July 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 12 July 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2018 02 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 31 December 2018 31 days late