THE GRIPS BRANCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Since its inception the organisation has been helping a variety of individuals and families who have or do currently work in the film and television industry. The type of financial help includes; widows and widowers; families of those recently bereaved; the sick or terminally ill, those who have fallen into financial need through accidents at work or illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 November 2016: CIO registration
- GRIPS BRANCH BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Cross | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Ogden | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Muir | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Rich | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES SAMS | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.17k | £13.50k | £13.94k | £18.48k | £32.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.31k | £13.08k | £16.54k | £13.76k | £27.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG AND PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO EMPLOYEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS OR IMMEDIATE RELATIVES OF INDIVIDUALS WORKING WITHIN THE MOTION PICTURE AND TELEVISION INDUSTRY OR PERSONS OR THEIR DEPENDANTS OR IMMEDIATE RELATIVES WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME BEEN EMPLOYED WITHIN THE MOTION PICTURE AND TELEVISION INDUSTRY. 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Panavision UK
The Metropolitan Centre
Bristol Road
Greenford
UB6 8GD
- Phone:
- 02088397314
- Email:
- webmaster@gripsbranch.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window