BRASSINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a Village Hall facility for Social, Recreational, Educational and Village Governance use by the local Community of Brassington. Also to provide this facility for use by others not resident in the Parish of Brassington at the discretion of the Village Hall Management Committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 03 September 1979: Standard registration
- BRASSINGTON VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGELA WOOLLEY | Chair | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JUNE BALDWIN | Trustee | 05 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MELISSA Barron | Trustee | 17 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA GLITHERO | Trustee | 17 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROD PRINCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH WHERRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY PERKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JENNY JACK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY SLATER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUCY ELIZABETH WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH FARGEANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE ALLCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.53k | £4.76k | £9.76k | £9.83k | £9.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.33k | £4.87k | £6.25k | £6.41k | £6.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 1 AUGUST 1979
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THEBENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF BRASSINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Somerville Cottage
Town Street
Brassington
Matlock
DE4 4HB
- Phone:
- 01629540818
- Email:
- junebaldwin1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window