LIFE GLOBAL UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention and relief of poverty of people living in UK and India through the provision of training, education, financial assistance and loans. Life Global UK will partner with various well established charities in UK and India
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 20 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAMESH JAMNADAS SHAH | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|||||
MEETAL SHAH | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
BHOGILAL SANGHVI | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
KIRIT VASSA | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
BINA SANGHVI | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.24k | £149.00k | £11.38k | £601 | £34.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.52k | £135.13k | £17.37k | £7.58k | £34.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UK AND INDIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, EDUCATION, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND LOANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 St Johns Road
Harrow
Middlesex
HA1 2EY
- Phone:
- 07801150338
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window