Financial history POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN CARDIFF

Charity number: 1173080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.36k £0 £6.55k £12.28k £13.42k
Total expenditure £11.26k £3.39k £9.21k £14.07k £12.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A