1ST BURNTWOOD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 509085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scout Group

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £20,573
Total expenditure: £30,719

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 August 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tracy Beer Trustee 28 June 2021
None on record
Philip PIPE Trustee 28 June 2021
None on record
Julie Anne Nicholas Trustee 07 May 2020
None on record
Richard John Busby Trustee 07 May 2020
None on record
Richard Williams Trustee 07 May 2020
None on record
Christopher David Quick Trustee 07 May 2020
None on record
Emma Elizabeth Busby Trustee 07 May 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.10k £22.55k £16.07k £18.67k £20.57k
Total expenditure £23.06k £10.67k £14.62k £31.41k £30.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £500 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Paviors Road
BURNTWOOD
Staffordshire
WS7 3QP
Phone:
07725088326
Website:

1stburntwood.org.uk