AL-SUNNAH MOSQUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE HOLY QURAN AND SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MOHAMMED (PBUH). (A) THE INDIVIDUAL AND COMMUNAL DAILY PRAYERS (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS SALAAT) (B) THE COMMUNAL PRAYER MADE ON FRIDAYS (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS JUMAAH) (C) THE REGULAR COMMUNAL GATHERINGS FOR THE REMEMBRANCE OF ALLAH AND FOR THE RECITATION OF EXTRACTS OF THE QURAN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 December 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMGED BENZREBA | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|||||
MHD AL-NAJJAR | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
BOULAKHRAS CHOKRI | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ABDULGHADER AL-MUSRATI | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.61k | £146.00k | £189.60k | £193.75k | £263.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.00k | £139.36k | £147.37k | £184.47k | £261.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £54.58k | N/A | £500 | £4.11k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2022 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2022 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 March 2021 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 March 2021 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED ON 05 DEC 2016 as amended on 18 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH QURAN AND SUNNAH OF PRO.PHET MOHAMMED (PBUH) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Al-Sunnah Mosque
13 Winterford Road
MANCHESTER
M8 9PB
- Phone:
- 01614920699
- Email:
- alsunnahmosque@ymail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window