Financial history THE GLOBAL PEACEMAKERS

Charity number: 1169998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.29k £15.72k £34.56k £62.19k £50.08k
Total expenditure £8.31k £15.31k £28.20k £42.56k £47.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.15k